Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Natailie Crystal Sparrow, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against George Edward Potts Iii, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with John Beamer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryChild Support Dor |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Before Hearing
Judge: John Beamer |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Order of Dismissal Before Hearing
Judge: John Beamer |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent
Judge: John Beamer |
|
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pluries Summons Unserved
Judge: John Beamer |
|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pluries Summons Issued
Judge: John Beamer |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Pluries Summons Unserved
Judge: John Beamer |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Pluries Summons Issued
Judge: John Beamer |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Returned Unserved
Judge: John Beamer |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Issued
Judge: John Beamer |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved
Judge: John Beamer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.