Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gail S Charles filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Janet C Thorpe presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2014 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2018 | Hearing | Probate - Thorpe, Janet C (Actual: Thorpe, Janet C) | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Probate - Thorpe, Janet C (Actual: Thorpe, Janet C)
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Comments: 6/20/18 at 1:30pm
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Evidence Control Sheet
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
March 21, 2017 | Hearing | Probate - Harris, Jenifer M (Actual: Harris, Jenifer M) | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Probate - Harris, Jenifer M (Actual: Harris, Jenifer M)
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.