Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jennifer Gayle Hollis, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Dicky Ray Dingess, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Alicia L Latimore presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlicia L Latimore Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2013 | Hearing | Motion - LeBlanc, Bob (Actual: LeBlanc, Bob) | |
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Motion - LeBlanc, Bob (Actual: LeBlanc, Bob)
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Denying
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Testimony with Attachments
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Cancellation of Hearing
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Cancellation of Hearing
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.