Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aibines Maldonado, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Anibal Gonzalez, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Diana M. Tennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiana M. Tennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Evidence Control Sheet
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
|
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report and Recommendation of Magistrate
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Parenting Plan
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report of Magistrate
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice to Produce
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Parenting Class Certificate
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Referral Magistrate
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice to Produce
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Parenting Class Certificate
Judge: Diana M. Tennis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.