Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gmac Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Tara Castillo, against Jaime De Fex, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc Gmac Mortgage Corporation Anf, Ofelia De Fex, represented by David Pedersen, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Chad K Alvaro presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChad K Alvaro Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCa - Homestead Residential Foreclosure Btwn $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title 37436399 Comments: no disbursements copies to all parties sent to rec check 128401 | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Bid Amount 37131616 Comments: $132,100.00 by pltf, doc stamps $924.70 | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale 37138728 Comments: cpy to all parties; ds chk#128401 | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale 36880079 | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale 36846608 Comments: 1/14/2015 | |
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form 35172147 | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Judgment 35132591 | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING - Non-Jury Trial - Prather, Charles (Actual: Prather, Charles) | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney's Fees 35132596 | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form 35132594 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.