Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank National Association Jp Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp Trst, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Edward Pritchard, against Gera Nwosu Gerald Nwosu Aka, Orange County Florida, Unknown Tenants Owners, Waterview Townhomes Homeowners Association Inc, represented by Kwesi Korreh, Wanzo Galloway, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Luis F Calderon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2012 |
CategoryCa - Homestead Residential Foreclosure Above $250,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Trial - Coleman, Ted | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal 31401602 Comments: STIPULATED | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal 31401602 | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form 31401600 | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Witness and Exhibit List 31066997 | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Minutes 30845938 | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Setting Trial 30849973 Comments: 04/08/2014 @ 9:30AM | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer 30825578 | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non Military Service 31036182 Comments: as to Gera Nwosu | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Default to Court 30812191 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.