Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lorriel Blaise, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Jill Schwartz, against Orlando Mobile Laser & Aesthetic Services Llc, represented by Dorothy Green, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Donald E Grincewicz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2011 |
CategoryCa - Discrimination - Employment Or Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 25651848 Comments: with prejudice; sent to rec 1/17/13 | |
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal 25651848 | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED 24795423 | |
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 24474495 Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce 24474496 Comments: Response to Request to Produce | |
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Designation of Email Address 24475493 Comments: Notice of Designation of Email Address | |
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions 24474497 Comments: Response to Request for Admissions | |
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation 24436982 Comments: AMENDED Notice of Mediation | |
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation 24166232 Comments: Notice of Mediation | |
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories 23526999 Comments: AND FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.