Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kasey Violet Clark, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Janet C Thorpe presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2010 |
CategorySummary Administration Over $1000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Claim Signed by Clerk & Mailed
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement of Claim Comments: Orlando Health Inc
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Claim Signed by Clerk & Mailed
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement of Claim Comments: State of Florida
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
April 11, 2012 | Hearing | Ex Parte - Bronson, Theotis | |
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Summary Administration
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.