Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Edward Pritchard, against Bank Of America Na, Hunters Creek Community Association Inc, Joyce Minko, Oz Clp Hunters Creek Llc, Palisades Collection Llc, (total of 8) See All represented by Charles Harden, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Lisa T. Munyon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa T. Munyon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCa - Homestead Residential Foreclosure Btwn $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Answer 16218611 Comments: OBO HUD
Date: March 11, 2011Voluntary Dismissal 17559004
Date: June 28, 2011Exhibits in Support of 16218610 Comments: OBO HUD
Date: March 11, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 17559004 Comments: w/o prejudice & release of lp *sent to rec 6/28/11*
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal 17559004
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form 17559005 Comments: Final Disposition Form
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer 16218611 Comments: OBO HUD
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibits in Support of 16218610 Comments: OBO HUD
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered by the Clerk 16088605 Comments: clerk may not enter default as to 1 party - required time of service not met
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice 16081468 Comments: of borrower non participation with RMFM Program
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment 16047962
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney's Fees 16047959
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support 16047960
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.