Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Crum And Forster Insurance Company, Gulfwind Management Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Daniel Traver, Scott Katz, against Grassia Murphy And Lupan Pa, Lenders Title And Escrow Llc, Logator Capital Llc, Thomas C Grassia, represented by Katarzyna Pabis, Nicholas Dareneau, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Kevin B. Weiss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryBc - Breach Of Agreement/Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Answer 17099824 Comments: AMENDED ANSWER DEFENSES AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 19, 2011Motion 16326278 Comments: TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT
Date: March 18, 2011Letter 18008984 Comments: HONORABLE FREDERICK J. LAUTEN
Date: August 04, 2011Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel 21425411 Comments: WITH ATTACHED PROPOSED ORDER
Date: February 15, 2012Objection 21599420 Comments: Objection
Date: February 29, 2012Order 22883349 Comments: ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS
Date: June 11, 2012Order Granting 18623875 Comments: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENSES AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 26, 2011Order 23647785 Comments: FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: August 09, 2012Order 18059016 Comments: ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: August 09, 2011Order 24344984 Comments: AMENDED ORDER FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: October 02, 2012Motion for Order 21332431 Comments: TO SHOW CAUSE WHY LOGATOR SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN COMTEMPT
Date: February 07, 2012Disclosure of Experts 19381111 Comments: Disclosure of Experts
Date: November 30, 2011Notice of Filing 24753117 Comments: OFFER OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2012Disclosure of Experts 21029050 Comments: Disclosure of Experts
Date: January 13, 2012Exhibits in Support of 22714877 Comments: TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: May 25, 2012Joint Stipulation for Dismissal 25237653 Comments: sent to rec on 12/11
Date: December 11, 2012Order 21351685 Comments: REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS
Date: February 08, 2012Order 21139517 Comments: AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AS TO PRE-TRIAL ONLY - 5/21/12 PTC
Date: January 23, 2012Order of Dismissal 25241076
Date: December 11, 2012Notice of Filing 24064671 Comments: PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2012Exhibits in Support of 22623234 Comments: MOTION TO STRIKE, EXHIBIT A
Date: May 18, 2012Order 21573413 Comments: APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 27, 2012Final Judgment 22883348
Date: June 11, 2012Joint Stipulation of Dismissal 25237653
Date: December 11, 2012Order Granting Telephonic Appearance 18544773
Date: September 19, 2011Order 17850422 Comments: ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: July 22, 2011Final Judgment 24344983 Comments: copy sent to recording 10/2/12
Date: October 02, 2012Letter 24065867 Comments: TO JUDGE LISA MUNYON
Date: September 10, 2012Notice 20647242 Comments: OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANT, GRASSIA, MURPHY AND LUPAN, P.A.
Date: December 28, 2011Final Judgment 24344983
Date: October 02, 2012Notice 21895742 Comments: RULE 1.720 MEDIATION NOTICE
Date: March 21, 2012Exhibits in Support of 22623235 Comments: MOTION TO STRIKE, EXHIBIT B
Date: May 18, 2012Order 16959394 Comments: ON MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 09, 2011Motion for Continuance 21430506 Comments: Motion for Continuance
Date: February 15, 2012Notice of Compliance 21436342 Comments: WITH COURT ORDER REGARDING EXCHANGING EXPERT REPORTS
Date: February 15, 2012Letter 21430507 Comments: LETTER
Date: February 15, 2012Notice of Mediation 21436202 Comments: Notice of Mediation
Date: February 15, 2012Motion for Continuance 21460883 Comments: AMENDED Motion for Continuance AND ENLARGEMENT OF TIME
Date: February 17, 2012Request for Copies 21693456 Comments: TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 07, 2012Request for Copies 21693470 Comments: TO LOGATOR CAPITAL
Date: March 07, 2012Notice of Mediation 21973195 Comments: 1.720
Date: March 29, 2012Motion for Summary Judgment 22502840 Comments: Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 09, 2012Motion to Dismiss 22549843 Comments: COUNTS VII, VIII & IX
Date: May 14, 2012Motion In Limine 22594817 Comments: REGARDING EXPERT TESTIMONY
Date: May 16, 2012Motion In Limine 22594846 Comments: REGARDING LOGATOR�S USE OF FUNDS
Date: May 16, 2012Memorandum 22714879 Comments: TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: May 25, 2012Reply 22737540 Comments: TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 29, 2012Motion 22801326 Comments: TO DETERMINE PROPER CHOICE OF LAW
Date: June 01, 2012Response in Opposition to 22808483 Comments: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: June 04, 2012Memorandum 22875585 Comments: TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: June 08, 2012Brief 23193880 Comments: CLOSING ARGUMENT
Date: July 03, 2012Exhibits in Support of 22974052 Comments: Exhibit in Support of
Date: June 15, 2012Exhibits in Support of 23198449 Comments: CLOSING ARGUMENT
Date: July 03, 2012Brief 23198450 Comments: CLOSING ARGUMENT
Date: July 03, 2012Memorandum 23308615 Comments: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS CLOSING
Date: July 13, 2012Brief 23318881 Comments: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S CLOSING
Date: July 13, 2012Brief 23318882 Comments: OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S CLOSING
Date: July 13, 2012Motion to Tax Costs 24056256 Comments: Motion to Tax Costs
Date: September 07, 2012Memorandum 51045332 Comments: OF LAW ON MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: August 08, 2016Motion to Withdraw 26743392
Date: April 04, 2013Motion for Writ of Garnishment 51001325
Date: August 05, 2016Answer of Garnishee 51666694
Date: September 01, 2016Motion for Final Judgment 54055971 Comments: of garnishment
Date: December 22, 2016Response 53008447
Date: November 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 55207157
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment 55207158 Comments: in garnishment LEVIN, PAPANTONIO, THOMAS, MITCHELL, RAFFERTY & PROCTOR PC - sent to e-recording
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment 54055971 Comments: of garnishment
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response 53008447
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request 52943237 Comments: for a Hearing
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply 52131203 Comments: GARNISHEE S ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING AMENDED ANSWER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A HEARING (Crum & Forster Insurance Company)
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service 51720411
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee 51666694
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 51215978 Comments: LEVIN PAPANTONIO THOMAS MITCHELL RAFFRTY
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service 51139574
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.