Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Scott Lin, against Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By, Christy Perez Christy R Perez Aka, Sandy Creek Homeowners Association Inc, Tenant 1, Tenant 2, (total of 9) See All represented by Charles Castellon, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Paetra Brownlee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCa - Homestead Residential Foreclosure Above $250,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Motion to Dismiss 16841928 Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: April 28, 2011Request to Produce 16841929 Comments: Request to Produce
Date: April 28, 2011Answer & Affirmative Defenses 18483707 Comments: Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 15, 2011Request 18924865 Comments: TO PARTIPATE IN RMFM PROGRAM
Date: October 21, 2011Response 23888541 Comments: TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Cancellation of Hearing 26089842 Comments: 2/25/2013 9am
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 25706403 Comments: 2/25/13 at 900 am
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Setting Aside/Vacating 25648504
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter 25648505
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 25648503 Comments: Cancel Sale, Cancel LP and Setting Aside FJ and Return Originals
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 25609678
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form 25609679
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
December 11, 2012 | Hearing | CANCELED-Cancel Sale - Order Cancelling Sale Date - Foreclosure, Sales | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
HEARING - CANCELED-Cancel Sale - Order Cancelling Sale Date - Foreclosure, Sales
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Cancel Sale 25189931 Comments: 12/11/2012
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.