Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
William David Conine, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Juanita Cobb, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Vincent S. Chiu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2009 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Final Judgment
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Financial Affidavit
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.