Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Joise Ramos Of The Estate Of Sonia Mercado-Bosque Prep, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Michael Carter, against Flnc Inc Florida Living Nursing Center Dba, represented by Launa Rutherford, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Chad K Alvaro presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2013 |
CategoryCa - Negligence Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Voluntary Dismissal 62361112
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Settlement 61780630
Date: August 20, 2018Order 61451984 Comments: regarding trial conflict
Date: July 30, 2018Motion 61399598 Comments: TO DETERMINE TRIAL CONFLICT
Date: July 23, 2018Order 61153740 Comments: Pretrial Checklist & Order Controlling Trial
Date: July 09, 2018Disclosure of Experts 58835793
Date: January 10, 2018Joint Pre Trial Statement 61184032
Date: July 05, 2018Order Striking 55710211 Comments: case from trial docket
Date: May 04, 2017Mediation Report 57391415 Comments: NO AGREEMENT
Date: September 15, 2017Notice of Mediation 57148577 Comments: on 9/15/2017 at 9a
Date: August 24, 2017Copies of Appeal Index Mailed 52013849
Date: September 16, 2016Disclosure of Experts 56225934
Date: June 14, 2017Order to Supplement the Record on Appeal 51534258 Comments: Granted and Due 9/14
Date: August 26, 2016Notice of Cross Appeal 49230160
Date: May 25, 2016Petition or Motion to Strike 54498093 Comments: case from July 2017 trial docket
Date: January 31, 2017Copies of Appeal Index Mailed 51352524
Date: August 22, 2016Notice of Appeal 48979794 Comments: FLNC INC
Date: May 16, 2016Motion for Reconsideration 47979219
Date: April 05, 2016Objection 47393298 Comments: to Plaintiff's Motion for Taxation of Costs - FLNC Inc
Date: March 14, 2016DCA Order Declining Referral to Mediation 50081740 Comments: 5D16-1725
Date: June 30, 2016Acknowledgment of Appeal 49094688 Comments: 5D16-1725 (NON-FINAL)
Date: May 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Disposal of Exhibits 64414999
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Disposal of Exhibits 64414998
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Disposal Listing 64415006
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal 62361112
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement 61780630
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion In Limine 61759520 Comments: (OMNIBUS) DEFENDANT FLNC INC DBA FLORIDA LIVING NURSING CENTER
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion In Limine 61759523 Comments: TO EXCLUDE HEARSAY STATEMENTS CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S TESTIMONY REGARDING PURPORTED STATEMENTS MADE BY DECEDENT'S PHYSICIANS DEFT FLNC INC
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion In Limine 61759522 Comments: TO EXCLUDE INAPPROPRIATE COMMENTARY IN OPENING STATEMENT DEFENDANT FLNC INC
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum 61759521 Comments: OF LAW REGARDING THE USE OF THE "REPTILE THEORY" DEFENDANT FLNC INC
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion In Limine 61759519 Comments: REGARDING COVER UP AND INTENTIONAL MISCONDUCT ALLEGATIONS DEFENDANT FLNC INC
Judge: Chad K Alvaro |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.