Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SUNTRUST MORTGAGE INC, vs. BROOME, LARRY S et al
On May 20, 2008 a ca - mortgage foreclosure (filed prior to 6/1/2009) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL. Judge Luis F Calderon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 20, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 02, 2021
Filing Location
Orange County, FL
Category
CA - Mortgage Foreclosure (filed prior to 6/1/2009)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Letter 3653255 Comments: LetterLETTER FILED BY LYNN WALKER WRIGHT, P.A.
Date: Aug 21, 2008Complaint 3140487 Comments: ComplaintCOMPLAINT FILED
Date: May 20, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3653256 Comments: Summons Returned|30 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [7/29/2008] AS TO LARRY S. BROOME, JR.
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter 3653255 Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED BY LYNN WALKER WRIGHT, P.A.
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3653257 Comments: Summons Returned|30 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [7/29/2008] AS TO FARA BONTEMPO BROOME
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal 3667727 Comments: Voluntary Dismissal |VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - BEFORE HEARING WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS CLAIM
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal 3611266 Comments: Voluntary Dismissal |VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - BEFORE HEARING WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS CLAIM (SENT TO RECORDING 8/20/08)
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 3596135 Comments: Motion to Dismiss |MOTION TO DISMISS CROSS CLAIM
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 3610357 Comments: Motion to Dismiss|CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal 3504628 Comments: Voluntary Dismissal|VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CROSS CLAIM STILL PENDING) LARRY S BROOME;FARA BONTEMPO BROOME;RENZO A BONTEMPO;UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RENZO A BONTEMPO;JOHN DOE;MARY DOE;ISPC
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Cross Claim Summons Issued Comments: Cross Claim Summons Issued|CROSS CLAIM SUMMONS ISSUED (FARA BONTEMPO BROOME) ORIG TO ATTY SASE
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Cross Claim Summons Issued Comments: Cross Claim Summons Issued|CROSS CLAIM SUMMONS ISSUED (LARRY S BROOME JR) ORIG TO ATTY SASE
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer 3327913 Comments: Answer|DEFTS RENZO A BONTEMPO AND THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RENZO A BONTEMPO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer 19833080 Comments: Answer|DEFT THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN CO ANSWER (WITH EXHBS)
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service 3402162 Comments: Certificate of Service|CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Appearance of Counsel 3327912 Comments: Notice Appearance of Counsel|DEFT RENZO A BONTEMPO NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Appearance of Counsel 3327914 Comments: Notice Appearance of Counsel|DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RENZO A BONTEMPO NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter 3402163 Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Cross Claim 3402161 Comments: Cross Claim |CROSS CLAIM FILED
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter 3318546 Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED TO CLERK FROM DEBRA S JOHNSON PA (FAX)
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Appearance of Counsel 3318549 Comments: Notice Appearance of Counsel|DEFT RENZO A BONTEMPO NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Appearance of Counsel 3318548 Comments: Notice Appearance of Counsel|DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RENZO A BONTEMPO NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (FAX)
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service 3312337 Comments: Certificate of Service|CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COPY OF CROSS COMPLAINT BY NOT SPECIFIC W/ATTACHMENTS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer 3318547 Comments: Answer|DEFTS RENZO BONTEMPO AND THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RENZO A BONTEMPO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (FAX)
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3298032 Comments: Summons Returned|30 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [6/3/2008] AS TO LARRY S. BROOME, JR.
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3298035 Comments: Summons Returned|30 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [6/9/2008] AS TO RENZO A. BONTEMPO
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3298036 Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS UNSERVED AS TO MARY DOE
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3298034 Comments: Summons Returned|30 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [6/9/2008] AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RENZO A. BONTEMPO AKA DIANA BONTEMPO
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3298033 Comments: Summons Returned|30 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [6/3/2008] AS TO FARA BONTEMPO BROOME
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3298038 Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS UNSERVED AS TO JOHN DOE
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3298039 Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [5/30/2008] AS TO ISPC
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
30 Day Summons Issued Comments: 30 Day Summons Issued|30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO LARRY S BROOME JR ORG TO ANDREWS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
30 Day Summons Issued Comments: 30 Day Summons Issued|30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO RENZO A BONTEMPO ORG TO ANDREWS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
30 Day Summons Issued Comments: 30 Day Summons Issued|30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RENZO A BONTEMPO ORG TO ANDREWS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
30 Day Summons Issued Comments: 30 Day Summons Issued|30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO FARA BONTEMPO BROOME ORG TO ANDREWS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
30 Day Summons Issued Comments: 30 Day Summons Issued|30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JOHN DOE ORG TO ANDREWS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
30 Day Summons Issued Comments: 30 Day Summons Issued|30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MARY DOE ORG TO ANDREWS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ISPC ORG TO ANDREWS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Complaint 3140487 Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet 3140486 Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens 3140485 Comments: Lis Pendens|LIS PENDENS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Initial Judge Assigned Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED TURNER, T W 34
Judge: Luis F Calderon |