Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Orange Lake Country Club Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Danay Diaz, against Carolyn Mobley, Catherine M Silva, Christopher A Maragh, Corinna R Seaton, Hector L Castro, (total of 18) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with John Marshall Kest presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2008 |
CategoryCa - Timeshare Foreclosure (Filed Prior To 6/1/2009) |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint 3081435 Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED
Date: May 12, 2008Order of Setting Aside/Vacating 5383389
Date: March 09, 2009Voluntary Dismissal 5764488
Date: April 28, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes 23801162 Comments: COURT MINUTES
Judge: John Marshall Kest |
|
August 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 23772606
Judge: John Marshall Kest |
|
August 16, 2012 | Hearing | Status Hearing - Doherty, Patricia A (Actual: Doherty, Patricia A) | |
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Status Hearing - Doherty, Patricia A (Actual: Doherty, Patricia A)
Judge: John Marshall Kest |
|
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear 22896613 Comments: 08/16/2012 1:30pm
Judge: John Marshall Kest |
|
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form 14219544 Comments: Final Disposition Form
Judge: John Marshall Kest |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Disbursement 13572101 Comments: Count V
Judge: John Marshall Kest |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Title 13572083 Comments: Count V; Copy sent to recording; Check #7646
Judge: John Marshall Kest |
|
July 21, 2010 | Hearing | Sale Date - Foreclosure, Sales | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Bid Amount Comments: COUNT V; $100 by plaintiff
Judge: John Marshall Kest |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.