Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aurora Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Caryn Graham, against Gladys Barrios, Jane Doe, John Doe, Pedro Barrios, Unknown Spouse Of Ada Montoyo, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Luis F Calderon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2008 |
CategoryCa - Mortgage Foreclosure (Filed Prior To 6/1/2009) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint 3079676 Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED
Date: May 12, 2008Voluntary Dismissal 14798208 Comments: sent to rec 11/12
Date: November 11, 2010Voluntary Dismissal 14798208
Date: November 11, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form 14809156
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal 14809157 Comments: previously filed through ECF
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
November 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal 14798208 Comments: sent to rec 11/12
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
November 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal 14798208
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
November 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form 14798207 Comments: Final Disposition Form
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 14606946
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear 13905628 Comments: 10/25/10 @ 1:30pm
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 3356549 Comments: Affidavit of Service|AFFIDAVIT SUMMONS UNSERVED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ADA MONTOYO
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3356548 Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS UNSERVED AS TO JANE DOE
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned 3356547 Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS UNSERVED AS TO GLADYS BARRIOS
Judge: Luis F Calderon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.