Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Annette F Mascolo, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Greg Davison, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Alicia L Latimore presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2006 |
CategoryDating Violence |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Division
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Final Order of Injunction
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
February 15, 2006 | Hearing | Order - Deactivated, Deactivated | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Disposed by Judge
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Order - Deactivated, Deactivated
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order for Temporary Injunction
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
|
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Initial Judge Assigned
Judge: Alicia L Latimore |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.