Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alejandro Sanchez-Perez, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Vickie Stumpfig, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Vincent S. Chiu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2006 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Delinquency Recorded
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certified Notice of Delinquent Support
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Disposed by Judge
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
January 08, 2008 | Hearing | Status Hearing - Munyon, Lisa T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.