Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cibelis Mercedes, filed a(n) Ca - Other case represented by Ricardo Calzada, against Kenneth Sorano, Frecia M Osorno, K R S Enterprises Of Central Florida Inc, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Kevin B. Weiss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2006 |
CategoryCa - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal 4778258 Comments: Voluntary Dismissal |VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - BEFORE HEARING WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Returned 4413184 Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [02/08/2006]AS TO K R S ENTERPRISES OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Returned 4413174 Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [02/08/2006]AS TO SORANO, KENNETH | |
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|(3) 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED, ORIG ATTY (F) | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Initial Judge Assigned Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED KIRKWOOD, L R 33 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.