Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ijahka T Williams, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James Lynch, against Nicole E Clute, represented by Christopher Harne, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Chad K Alvaro presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2006 |
CategoryCa - Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Letter 10446100 | |
April 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal 1346855 Comments: Order of Dismissal|JOINT MOTION/ORDER DISMISSAL - BEFORE HEARING WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Mediation Report 1317734 Comments: Mediation Report|REPORT OF MEDIATION - SETTLED | |
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference 1119757 Comments: Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference|ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 07/30/2007 09:30 A.M. | |
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice for Trial 1037078 Comments: Notice for Trial|NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET FOR TRIAL (JURY) (SASE) | |
December 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation 936103 Comments: Notice of Mediation|NOTICE OF SETTING MEDIATION: 3/26/07 AT 9AM | |
November 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s) 855658 Comments: Amended Notice of Taking Deposition|AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO OF IJAHKA T WILLIAMS, 12/1/06, 10:00 | |
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance 856424 Comments: Notice of Compliance|DEFT NICOLE E CLUTES COMPLIANCE W/REQUEST FOR COPIES (FLORIDA HOSPITAL) | |
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition(s) 832118 Comments: Notice of Taking Deposition|NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF IJAHKA T WILLIAMS, 11/10/06, 10:00 | |
September 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Compliance with Request for Copies 798146 Comments: Compliance With Request for Copies|NICOLE E CLUTE'S COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.