Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citimortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Maria Solomon, against Jane Doe, Jessica B Blake Jessica Blake Aka, John Doe, Sawmill Homeowners Association Inc, Unknown Spouse Of Jessica B Blake Aka Jessica, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Patricia L Strowbridge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2006 |
CategoryCa - Mortgage Foreclosure (Filed Prior To 6/1/2009) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Disposition Sheet 4894008 Comments: Disposition Sheet |DISPOSITION SHEET FILED | |
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal 4894007 Comments: Voluntary Dismissal |VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - BEFORE HEARING WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice Cancellation of Hearing 4779173 Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing|NOTICE CANCELLATION OF HEARING 04/06/2006 @ 08:45 AM | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING - Hearing Exparte - Strickland, Stan | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING - Hearing Exparte - Notice of Sale, Notice of Sale | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING - Hearing Exparte - Glatt, James E | |
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Default Entered by the Clerk 4840905 Comments: Default Entered by the Clerk|DEFAULT ENTERED BY THE CLERK AS TO SAWMILL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC COPY TO ATTY SASE | |
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing 4485476 Comments: Notice of Filing|PLTF CITIMORTGAGE INC NOTICE OF FILING DEFT JESSICA B BLAKE RESPONSE | |
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Parties 4471837 Comments: Notice of Dropping Parties|NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JESSICA BLAKE, JOHN & JANE DOE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.