Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Adrian Mccaskill, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Scott Miller, against David Buscall, Progressive Express Insurance Company, represented by John Bussey, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Luis F Calderon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2006 |
CategoryCa - Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal 17970486 | |
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Court Minutes 17952108 | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear 17016012 Comments: 08/01/2011 @ 3pm | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form 17016014 | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 16982282 Comments: Motion to dismiss sent by mail | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear 16890591 Comments: 08/01/11 at 3:00 pm | |
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal 1055034 Comments: Order of Dismissal|FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DAVID BUSCALL | |
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Letter 1049096 Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY JON J HERNAN | |
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Joint Stipulation for Dismissal 1031934 Comments: Joint Stipulation for Dismissal|JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS | |
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce 4819033 Comments: Response to Request to Produce|DEFT DAVID BUSCALL AMENDED RESPONSE TO PLTF REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.