Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marcus Brannum, filed a(n) Ca - Mandamus case against Public Defender, 9Th Judicial Circuit, State Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with John H Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn H Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2006 |
CategoryCa - Mandamus |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Final Judgment Comments: Final Judgment|FINAL ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS | |
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Response Comments: Response|REPLY TO RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS | |
June 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Order 4845230 Comments: Order|ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE REPLY TO RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS | |
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Order Comments: Order|ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE REPLY TO RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Response 4799828 Comments: Response|RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS BY PUBLIC DEFENDER (WRIT 06 32) | |
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Reassigned to Division Comments: Case Reassigned to Division|CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE FROM: 40 TO: 16 | |
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Initial Judge Assigned Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED ADAMS, J H 40 | |
March 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Petition 4618028 Comments: Petition|PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (WRIT #06-32) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.