Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marcel Cornelius, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Carl B Marshall, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryIncome Deduction Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Need for Redirection
Judge: |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Demographic Information Sheet
Judge: |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Need for Redirection
Judge: |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Termination of IV-D Services
Judge: |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address
Judge: |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Income Deduction Order
Judge: |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Closing/Disbursing Funds
Judge: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.