Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jennifer Marquinez, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Manuel A Martinez, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Mark S Blechman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2005 |
CategoryPaternity Dor |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Termination of IV-D Services
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Denying
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.