Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Douglas Bales, against Ford Motor Credit Company, Sky Lake South Homeowners Association Inc, Brite Top Roofing, Tenant #2, Tenant #1, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with John Marshall Kest presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryCa - Mortgage Foreclosure (Filed Prior To 6/1/2009) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service Comments: Certificate of Service|CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal Comments: Voluntary Dismissal |VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - BEFORE HEARING WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Disposition Sheet Comments: Disposition Sheet |DISPOSITION SHEET FILED | |
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [02/09/2006]AS TO FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY | |
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Lis Pendens Comments: Lis Pendens|AMENDED LIS PENDENS | |
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Issued Comments: Summons Issued|SUMMONS ISSUED AMENDED COMPLAINT (HANDED TO ANDREWS AGENCY) | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint Comments: Amended Complaint|AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Order Granting | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Comments: Letter|LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DOUGLAS ZAHM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.