Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Florida Department Of Agriculture And Con, filed a(n) Ca - Injunction case represented by Louis Stolba, against Anc Construction Inc, represented by Joseph Lane, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Luis F Calderon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryCa - Injunction |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Comments: Letter|LETTER TO JUDGE FROM LOUIS STOLBA | |
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Joint Settlement Agreement Comments: Joint Settlement Agreement|JOINT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - OTHER | |
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Answer & Affirmative Defenses Comments: Answer & Affirmative Defenses|ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEFT ANC CONSTRUCTION INC | |
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [12/12/2005] | |
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED, ORIG SHERIFF | |
December 06, 2005 | Docket Event | Initial Judge Assigned Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED GRINCEWICZ, D E 34 | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Request to Produce Comments: Request to Produce|PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Complaint Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Interrogatories Comments: Interrogatories |PLTF'SFIRST SET OF WRITTEN INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.