Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na For The Benefit Of Asset Backed Securities Corpora Obo, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Maria Melius, against Tenant #4, Tenant #3, Tenant #2, Tenant #1, Primequity Llc, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Chad K Alvaro presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryCa - Mortgage Foreclosure (Filed Prior To 6/1/2009) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING - Hearing Exparte - County Civil Mediation, County Civil Mediation | |
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING - Hearing Exparte - Kirkwood, Lawrence R | |
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING - Hearing Exparte - Glatt, James E | |
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal Comments: Voluntary Dismissal |VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - BEFORE HEARING WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Disposition Sheet Comments: Disposition Sheet |DISPOSITION SHEET FILED | |
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice Cancellation of Hearing Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing|NOTICE CANCELLATION OF HEARING 04/19/2006 @ 09:00 AM | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Comments: Notice of Hearing|NOTICE OF HEARING EXPARTE 04/19/2006 09:00 A.M. | |
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Default Entered by the Clerk Comments: Default Entered by the Clerk|DEFAULT ENTERED BY THE CLERK * C/COPY ATTY SASE * | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non Military Service Comments: Affidavit of Non Military Service|AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.