Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Island One Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lee Dani, against Mary Jo Harris, Susan M Caudill, Harriett A Bynoe, Cameron C Bynoe, Diana Cerrillos, (total of 27) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with John Marshall Kest presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCa - Timeshare Foreclosure (Filed Prior To 6/1/2009) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Disbursement Comments: Certificate of No Disbursement|CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT COUNT VI-MARGARET J. HAWKINS & ZACHERY JOYNER | |
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Comments: Certificate of Title|CERTIFICATE OF TITLE COUNT VI-MARGARET J. HAWKINS & ZACHERY JOYNER | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to be Issued Comments: Certificate of Title to be Issued|CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO BE ISSUED [10/04/2006] COUNT VI-MARGARET J. HAWKINS & ZACHERY JOYNER | |
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Receipt Comments: Receipt|SALE FEE PAID CI30 60.00 CLO 20060816 | |
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING - Notice of Sale - Glatt, James E | |
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING - Notice of Sale - Notice of Sale, Notice of Sale | |
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Comments: Certificate of Sale|CERTIFICATE OF SALE COUNT VI-MARGARET J. HAWKINS & ZACHERY JOYNER | |
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale Comments: Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale|PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF SALE | |
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Bid Amount Comments: Bid Amount|BID AMOUNT | |
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING - Notice of Sale - O'Kane, Julie H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.