Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fremont Investment And Loan, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lourdes Sanchez Barcia, against Jane Doe, John Doe, Unknown Spouse Of Hipolito Pena, Hipolito Pena, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Lisa T. Munyon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCa - Mortgage Foreclosure (Filed Prior To 6/1/2009) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Before Hearing Comments: Final Order of Dismissal Before Hearing|ORDER OF DISMISSAL - BEFORE HEARING WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY MARIOLA MUNOZ | |
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss Comments: Motion to Dismiss|PLTF FREMONT INVESTMENT AND LOAN MOTION TO DISMISS CASE AND CANCEL NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS UNSERVED HIPOLITO PENA | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS UNSERVED JANE DOE | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS UNSERVED JOHN DOE | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HIPOLITO PENA | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HIPOLITO ORIG LAURENCE BLACK | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JOHN DOE ORIG LAURENCE BLACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.