Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc Homecomings Financial Network Inc Anf, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Amy Post, against Unknown Spouse Of Stanley Bien Aime, Roseleine Louis Jean, Dustin Shawn Riddel, Jane As Doe, John Doe, (total of 7) See All represented by Kenneth Beane, Ninette Fletcher, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Luis F Calderon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2005 |
CategoryCa - Mortgage Foreclosure (Filed Prior To 6/1/2009) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Copy or Copies 24062112 Comments: Non Party Request | |
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Disbursed from Registry to: Comments: Disbursed from Registry to:|DISBURSED FROM REGISTRY TO: NINETTE FLETCHER PA TRUST ACCOUNT | |
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event | HEARING - Hearing - Turner, Thomas A | |
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Order Comments: Order|ORDER DIRECTING TO DISBERSE $16,624.99 TO NINETTE FLETCHER PA CC TO ACCT 9/20/05 | |
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter by Clerk (Check Returned Not Required) Comments: Letter by Clerk (Check Returned Not Required)|LETTER BY CLERK ($50 CHECK RETURNED NOT REQUIRED) | |
September 09, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice Appearance of Counsel Comments: Notice Appearance of Counsel|NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO STANLEY BIEN AIME | |
September 09, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED BY NINETTE S FLETCHER | |
September 09, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Comments: Notice of Hearing|NOTICE OF HEARING [09/20/2005] 09:00 A.M. | |
September 09, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Reopened Close on Re-Open Main #10 Comments: ***Case Reopened***Close on Re-Open Maintain #10***|****CASE RE-OPENED****CLOSE ON RE-OPEN MAINT #10** | |
September 09, 2005 | Docket Event | Motion Comments: Motion |MOTION TO OBTAIN SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF SASLE BY STANLEY BIEN-AIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.