Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Garza, Adam, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Swymn, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC REL HRG scheduled on 11/16/2023 at 0230 PM, MX - Judge REBECCA WHITE presiding. | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER OF MARRY C. WIDDOES RE: ADDRESS FOR ADAM GARZA | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT OF MEDIATOR | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PARTIAL MEDIATION AGREEMENT (PATERNITY) | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION APPROVING PARTIAL MEDIATION AGREEMENT | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.