Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mcnabb, Cynthia Clay, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcnabb, Garry, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with BUCHANAN, LAURIE E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUCHANAN, LAURIE E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF QDRO | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC REL HRG scheduled on 8/22/2023 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding. | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- CYNTHIA MCNABB | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.