Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Robertson, Brian J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Robertson, Nancy M, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with BUCHANAN, LAURIE E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC REL HRG scheduled on 7/26/2023 at 0230 PM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding. | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST NANCY ROBERTSON | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY SUBSERVICE ON 1/25/2023 TO ENOSINCIA CISNEROS FOR NANCY M ROBERTSON | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON JANUARY 25,2023 TO NANCY M ROBERTSON SERVED ON 01/25/2023 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT- NANCY M. ROBERTSON WITH PROPOSED DEFAULT | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 472023DR000042DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/25/2023 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.