Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Clay, Ashley Renee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Clay, Norman Russell Ii, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE DATA SHEET | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE CHECK-IN RECEIPT | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | (PETITIONER'S PROPOSED) PARENTING PLAN | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | WIFE'S EXHIBIT LIST TO CLERK | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | WIFE'S UNILATERAL PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | WIFE'S WITNESS LIST AND EXPERT DESIGNATION | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.