Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Ritchie, Justin Charles, against Flanagan Jr Deceased, The Unkn, Holley, Robert G, Padgett, Diana, Party 1, Unknown, Party 2, Unknown, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 27, 2023VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOSEPH FLANAGAN, JR, DECEASED (PROPOSED)
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT HOLLEY AKA ROBERT G HOLLEY II AKA ROBERT G HOLLEY
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN PARTY 1 (PROPOSED)
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN PARTY 2 (PROPOSED)
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOSEPH FLANAGAN, JR, DECEASED
Date: March 27, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: March 27, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS TO DIANA PADGETT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS TO ROBERT HOLLEY AKA ROBERT G HOLLEY II AKA ROBERT G HOLLEY (PROPOSED)
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO DIANA PADGETT
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO ROBERT HOLLEY A/K/A ROBERT G HOLLEY SERVED ON 04/04/2023
Date: August 08, 2023ANSWER OF ROBERT HOLLEY A/K/A ROBERT G. HOLLEY II A/K/A ROBERT G. HOLLEY
Date: May 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO DIANA PADGETT SUB SERVED ON 04/04/2023
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN PARTY #2 SERVED SUBSTITUTE 4-4-2023
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE TO THE UNKOWN HEIRS OF JOSPEH FLANAGAN JR
Date: August 08, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 09, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO UNKNOWN PARTY #1 SUB SERVED ON 04/04/2023
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: February 09, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED BY DISMISSAL | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO ROBERT HOLLEY A/K/A ROBERT G HOLLEY SERVED ON 04/04/2023 | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO DIANA PADGETT SUB SERVED ON 04/04/2023 | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN PARTY #2 SERVED SUBSTITUTE 4-4-2023 | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE TO THE UNKOWN HEIRS OF JOSPEH FLANAGAN JR | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO UNKNOWN PARTY #1 SUB SERVED ON 04/04/2023 | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF ROBERT HOLLEY A/K/A ROBERT G. HOLLEY II A/K/A ROBERT G. HOLLEY | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.