Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Thomas, Lonise M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Thomas, Tina M, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with BUCHANAN, LAURIE E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUCHANAN, LAURIE E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE - LONISE THOMAS | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (PROPOSED) (APPLICATION INCOMPLETE) | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER LONISE M. THOMAS | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO CHILD CUSTODY INTERROGATORIES | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO MANDATORY NONDISCLOSURE AND PARENTING COURSE | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION PROGRAM | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | LONISE THOMAS' MOTION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT / (PROPOSED) DEFAULT (NO DEFAULT ISSUED - RESPONDENT FILED ANSWER 12/27/2022) | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC REL HRG scheduled on 1/11/2024 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.