Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Norris, Charles, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case against 770 Capital Ventures Llc, represented by Harlowe, Scott Robert, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: September 15, 2022SUMMONS TO 770 CAPITAL VENTURES LLC C/O SETH WASSERMAN REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 15, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 15, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 15, 2022DEFENDANT 770 CAPITAL VENTURES LLC MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING
Date: October 13, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO 770 CAPITAL VENTURES LLC C/O SETH WASSERMAN REGISTERED AGENT
Date: September 15, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: October 13, 2022PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT 770 CAPITAL VENTURES LLC MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO 770 CAPITAL VENTURES LLC C/O SETH WASSERMAN REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED) | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO 770 CAPITAL VENTURES LLC C/O SETH WASSERMAN REGISTERED AGENT | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 472022CA000192CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/15/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.