Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Deschamps, Bridget Maria Hennr, State Of Fl. Dept. Of Revenue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Scott, Harold Christopherwayn, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERCEPT $3221.00 CREDIT | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERCEPT $1701.13 CREDIT | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO THE CLERK (OA86) CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST (CS-OA86) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET (CS-ES15) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | OA40 - FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.