Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Herrera, Fernando, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Baza Urbina, Ana Karen, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER ON AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF PARENTING PLAN/TIME SHARING SCHEDULE, CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF AND APPROVING STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT / ORDER UPON RECOMMENDED ORDER | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | UPDATED FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM)- FERNANDO HERRERA | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT / CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENT HISTORY | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER ON FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED 10/17/2023, FORMER WIFE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED 10/04/2023, FORMER WIFE'S AMENDED MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FILE 10/03/2023, FORMER WIFE'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FILED 08/03/2023 AND FORMER WIFE'S MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR UPDATED MANDATORY DISCLOSURE FILED 05/05/2023 | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC REL HRG scheduled on 12/1/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge TERRY SLUSHER presiding. | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.