Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Miller, Van Robert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miller, Heide Lee, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with BUCHANAN, LAURIE E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUCHANAN, LAURIE E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION APPROVING MEDIATED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR'S DISPOSITION REPORT | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC REL HRG scheduled on 3/3/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding. | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING TRIAL | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | WIFE'S EXHIBIT LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.