Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hawes, Charles R, Hawes, Kimberly, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Lefebvre, Gerald Alan, against Cable Television & Installatio, Comcast Corporation, Comcast Of Florida Georgia Pe, represented by Rudd, Michael Picton, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Residenti |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 69386 | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO CABLE TELEVISION & INSTALLATION SERVICES, INC. C/O CRAIG E. BEHRENFELD | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT COMCAST'S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST CABLE TELEVISION & INSTALLATION SERVICES, INC. | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $395.00 Receipt Number MX 67567 | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $395.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.