Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Branstetter, Robert, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Marker, Shaun James, against Capitol Preferred Insurance Co, represented by Zigelsky, Andrea Ruth, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2015 |
CategoryOther-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DATED 11/02/2016 FROM ROLAND V. BERNAL | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING OFFER OF JUDGMENT/PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S' RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE AND INTERROGATORIES DATED FEBRUARY 4, 2016 | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO ROBERT BRANSTETTER AS TRUSTEE FOR THE JEANNE BRANSTETTER TRUST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.