Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Murphy, Judith D, Murphy, Timothy Travis, River Country Land And Cattle, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Wiederhold, John Philip, against The Charter Oak Fire Insurance, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2015 |
CategoryOther-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO TRENDA BAKER AS SENIOR CLERK FOR THE CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER, RA 6/23/2015 | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 37219 | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FOR THE CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (PROPOSED) | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.