Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bermudez, David, Vasquez, Juana, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Manzanilla, Leo A., against Citizens Property Insurance Co, represented by Grimsley, Charles Jarrett, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Laurie E. Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2015 |
CategoryOther-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 3/7/2017 @ 9:00 AM ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 3/7/2017 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding. | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN. 2.516 | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES - STRICKEN FROM DOCKET DUE TO NON-APPEARANCE BY THE PARTIES | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 9/20/2016 @ 9:00 AM ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 9/20/2016 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge GARY SWEET presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.