Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sweat, James, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Leconey, Scott Robert, against Coco Sod Farms Inc, represented by Cameron, Colin Munro, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sweet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sweet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER JURISDICTION | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE SWEET FROM ATTY. SCOTT R. LECONEY | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLING 5/11/2016 HEARING | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER JURISDICTION | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 5/11/2016 @ 9:00 AM ON STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 5/11/2016 @ 9:00 AM ON STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 5/11/2016 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge GARY SWEET presiding. | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND JOINT MOTION TO PERMIT WITHDRAWAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.