Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Debatt, Andrea, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Berg, Paul Richard, against Holt, Carl, Murphy, Christine, Rent A Center East, Inc, represented by Anderson, Gregory Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Laurie E. Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie E. Buchanan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2015 |
CategoryNegligence- Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORDED 4DCA MANDATE- AFFIRMED | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | 4DCA ORDER RE: MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD AND TOLL TIME GRANTED | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | 4DCA ORDER RE: MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD GRANTED | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL TRANSCRIPT FROM 9/21/2018 - VOLUME IV | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL TRANSCRIPT FROM 9/20/2018 - VOLUME III | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL TRANSCRIPT FROM 9/18/2018, VOLUME II | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL TRANSCRIPT FROM 9/17/2018 VOLUME I | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- RECORD ON APPEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.