Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Soffler, Jeremy Ariel, against Capstone Industries Of Central, Wallace, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2014 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED ON MICHAEL WALLACE ON 6/9/2014 | |
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES | |
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Payment received: $20.00 Receipt Number MX 20977 | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00 | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | COPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAPSTONE INDUSTRIES OF CENTRAL FLA A/K/A CAP STONE INDUSTRIES OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC., C/O REGISTERED AGENT LEIF GRAZI | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | COPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHAEL WALLACE | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.