Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Garcia, Ciro, filed a(n) Other case represented by Harvin, Wesley Reid, against Alfred Franklin Davis, Unknown, Atwood, Scott E, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corpo, Culligan, Cathy Ann, Davis, (total of 5) See All represented by Juster, Paul Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2013 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO dismissed 2/10/2014 | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF CIRO GARCIA'S ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT - GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DATED 12/5/2013 FROM PAUL J. JUSTER | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Payment received: $395.00 Receipt Number MX 15782 | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.