Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Flagstar Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown, Tenant #2, Rusinko, Jeffrey, Rusinko, Georgia L, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Elizabeth A. Metzger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2012 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Homestead Resid $50,001-249,999 |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE HELD ON MAY 1, 2013, VACATE CERTIFICATE OF SALE, STOP THE ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE, VACATE JUDGMENT, DIRECT CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS, RELEASE LIS PENDENS AND DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION GRANTED | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 6/4/2013 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge ELIZABETH METZGER presiding. | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE HELD ON MAY 1, 2013, VACATE CERTIFICATE OF SALE, STOP THE ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE, AND IF ALREADY ISSUED, DIRECT CLERK TO VACATE THE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE, VACATE JUDGMENT, DIRECT CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS, RELEASE LIS PENDENS AND DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION EFILE | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE HELD ON MAY 1, 2013, VACATE CERTIFICATE OF SALE, STOP THE ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE, AND IF ALREADY ISSUED, DIRECT CLERK TO VACATE THE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE, VACATE JUDGMENT, DIRECT CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS, RELEASE LIS PENDENS AND DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION EFILE | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | INTENT TO BID FORM OF MARSHALL D. SIMMONS | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | INTENT TO BID FORM OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | INTENT TO BID FORM OF ANN & SAMMY HANCOCK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.